04/04/2014

Mental Maths Multiplication and Squaring Tricks


Hi, welcome to nrrbeassistance.blogspot.comMental Maths Multiplication and Squaring Tricks and Shortcuts for the jobs, bank exams like RBI / SBI / IBPS CWE / RRB. Useful in the preparation of quantitative aptitude &/ numerical ability for the pupil preparing probationary officers (PO) / specialist officer (SO) / manager / assistants / clerks posts and others.

Mental Maths Multiplication and Squaring Tricks and Shortcuts

Some useful formulae
Formula: (a+b)2 = a2 + 2ab + b2 
Ex.: 492 = (40 + 9) 2 = 1600 + 720 + 81 = 2401

Formula: (a-b) 2 = a2 –2ab + b2 
Ex.: 56 = (60 – 4) 2 = 3600 – 480 + 16 = 3136

Formula: (a+b) (a-b) = a2 – b2 
Ex.: 64 x 56 = (60 – 4) (60 + 4) = 3600 – 16 = 3584

Formula: (a+b) (c+d) = (ac + ad) + (bc + bd) 
Ex.: 23 x 34 = (20 + 3) (30 + 4) = 600 + 80 + 90 + 12 = 782

Formula:(a+b) (c-d) = (ac – ad) + (bc – bd) 
Ex.: 34 x 78 = (30 + 4) (80 – 2) = 2400 –60 + 320 – 8 = 2652

Formula:(a-b) (c-d) = (ac – ad) – (bc – bd) 
Ex.: 67 x 86 = (70 – 3) (90 – 4) = 6300 – 280 – 270 + 12 = 5762

X = 1 to 9 & Y = Any Number
Technique: (X5) 2 = 100X(X+1) + 25 
Ex.: 652 = 600(7) + 25 = 4200 + 25 = 4225

Technique: 25 x Y = (Y x 100)/4 
Ex.: 25 x 76 = 7600/4 = 1900

Technique: 50 x Y = (Y x 100)/2 
Ex.: 50 x 67 = 6700/2 = 3350

Technique: 75 x Y = 3(Y x 100)/4 
Ex.: 75 x 58 = (5800 x 3)/4 = 17400/4 = 4350

Tricks using (X5) 2
Technique: (X5 – a) 2 = (X5) 2 – X5(2a) + a2
Ex.: 632 = (65 – 2) 2 = 4225 – 260 + 4) = 3969

Technique: (X5 + a) 2 = (X5) 2 + X5(2a) + a2
Ex.: 672 = (65 + 2) 2 = 4225 + 260 + 4) = 4489

Squaring Numbers 52 to 99
Technique: a2 = [a - (100 – a)]100 + (100 – a) 2 
Ex.: 932 = (93 – 7)100 + 72 = 8649

Squaring Numbers 101 to 148
Technique: a2 = [a + (a – 100)]100 + (a – 100) 2 
Ex.: 1082 = (108 + 8)100 + 82 = 11664

Squaring Numbers near 1000
Technique: a2 = [a – (1000 – a)]1000 + (1000 – a) 2 
Ex.: 9942 = (994 – 6)1000 + 6 2 = 988036

Technique: a2 = [a + (a – 1000)]1000 + (a – 1000) 2 
Ex.: 10072 = (1007 + 7)1000 + 72 = 1014049

Squaring Numbers that end in 1
Technique: a2 = (a – 1) 2 + 2a - 1 
Ex.: 61 2 = 60 2 + 122 - 1 = 3600 + 121 = 3721

Squaring Numbers that end in 4
Technique: a2 = (a + 1)2 – (2a + 1) 
Ex.: 442 = 452 – (88 + 1) = 2025 - 89 = 1936

Squaring Numbers that end in 6
Technique: a2 = (a - 1)2 + (2a - 1) 
Ex.: 562 = 552 + 112 - 1 = 3025 + 111 = 3136

Squaring Numbers that end in 9
Technique: a2 = (a + 1) 2 – (2a + 1) 
Ex.: 792 = 802 – (158 + 1) = 6400 – 159 = 6341


Alerts: Dear viewer, “Hard work never fails”. Along with hard work include smart work for your goal. Your hard work and our smart work, guarantee success. To get in touch with you, we have created a WhatsApp Group named “Aptitude Study Materials”. Kindly send a message to +91-7893356131 as “add to Aptitude Study Materials" to add you to this group.

Updates: Don’t miss, what you want? So kindly, 1. Like our Facebook, 2. Subscribe by E-mail, 3. Follow our Google+, 4. Twitter 5. YouTube, 6. Download our Toolbar, 7. Install our App and 8. Others.

Help: If you have any suggestions, requests and problems, please comment below or ask us here.

Encourage us: Please don’t forget to G+1 and/ Like and/ Share and/ Recommend… thank you and all the best / best of luck for your bright future.

Our motto: Serve poor and needy whole heartedly – Nareddula Rajeev Reddy (NRR) and his team.

* Dear viewer, ask us what you want..?
EmoticonEmoticon

Request Admin

First search (top), didn't find; ask us, what you want? As a comment. ASAP, we will provide it...

*Interested to become co-admin, click here.